Financial history ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1162874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £852.18k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £821.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £169.73k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £331.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.61k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £250.34k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £103.14k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £165.40k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £821.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0