Financial history FRIENDS OF CASTLE MEDICAL GROUP

Charity number: 1162590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.33k £14.68k £11.04k £5.48k £2.87k
Total expenditure £1.75k £4.89k £5.56k £2.66k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A