ASSOCIATION OF PAKISTANI PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance to meritorious medical students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Lebanon
- Mali
- Morocco
- Pakistan
- Saudi Arabia
Governance
- 13 October 2015: CIO registration
- APPS UK FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Taimur Mirza | Chair | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Usman Khan | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAUF SAIMA | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Yasmeen Almas | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALIA ARIF | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHUJA REHMAN | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMED IQBAL | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.23k | £238.07k | £303.30k | £303.30k | £203.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.73k | £136.24k | £162.43k | £162.43k | £107.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF PAKISTANI PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS (APPS) OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ARE AS FOLLOWS: IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PAKISTAN THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF PHYSICIANS, SURGEONS, DENTISTS AND ALLIED HEALTH PROFESSIONALS (AND STUDENTS IN MEDICAL OR ALLIED FIELDS) IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, EXPERT ADVICE AND TRAINING; 2) RAISING HEALTH AWARENESS VIA TALKS, HEALTH STALLS AND BROCHURES; 3) SUPPORTING AND IMPROVING THE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM OF PAKISTAN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING PHYSICAL EXPERTISE AND BY WRITING AND REVIEWING THE HEALTH POLICIES AND STANDARDS; 4) RUNNING PROJECTS WHICH CAN SUPPORT THE HEALTH REQUIREMENTS OF THE POOR IN PAKISTAN’S RURAL AND MOST DEPRIVED AREAS; AND BY 5) ALLEVIATING THE SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF DISEASE, NATURAL DISASTERS, CATASTROPHES AND WAR, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN PAKISTAN, BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkway 5 Suite 2
Parkway Business Centre
300 Princess Road
Manchester
M14 7HR
- Phone:
- 07931591614
- Email:
- info@appsukfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window