Trustees RACE AGAINST BLOOD CANCER
Charity number: 1162696

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raman Olwen Sisupalan | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Idowu Benjamin Knox-Hooke | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dean Gardner | Trustee | 11 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hinesh Shah | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Westwood | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MELVIN GARDNER | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOE BATES | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.