ACTIVE STROKES NORTH EAST CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free lifelong support to stroke survivors and their families living in the North East of England. We provide two private group sessions per week, that include: pool exercise, chair-based exercise, physiotherapy, complementary therapy, drop-in social and use of the public gym. All under the supervision of qualified service providers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
- ASNE (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Mackenzie | Chair | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Dodds | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Sheed | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Waqar Bashir Ahmad | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon David Bell | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jane Gilhespy | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.16k | £1.51k | £6.68k | £7.84k | £21.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.76k | £1.09k | £6.71k | £7.79k | £7.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED STROKES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF STROKE AND THE EFFECTS OF CARING FOR STROKE SURVIVORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Cardigan Terrace
Heaton
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 5NX
- Phone:
- 07726539705
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window