Financial history UKRAINE CHARITY

Charity number: 1163036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.72k £3.32k £778.44k £1.53m £346.53k
Total expenditure £25.76k £11.19k £240.68k £1.73m £527.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £778.42k £1.46m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £64.37k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £14 £1.01k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £240.44k £1.70m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £245 £26.34k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A