Financial history THE MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP SUNBURY-ON-THAMES

Charity Number: 1162121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £193.80k £119.06k £181.44k £233.90k £255.52k
Total expenditure £185.69k £115.06k £161.21k £228.73k £229.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A