THE MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP SUNBURY-ON-THAMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is responsible for the care and the permanent public display of the Sunbury Millennium Embroidery and for the maintenance and administration of the gallery that houses the work. Entry to the view the work is free and talks are regularly given to visiting groups including local schools. The gallery hosts accompanying exhibitions and engages in a number of community projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 June 2015: CIO registration
- 20 February 2024: Funds received from 1085014 THE MILLENNIUM EMBROIDERY GROUP SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT SHAW | Chair | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nicol | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Robertson | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICK TILT | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WHEATLEY BARRISTER | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WATTS | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.80k | £119.06k | £181.44k | £233.90k | £255.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.69k | £115.06k | £161.21k | £228.73k | £229.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO THE ARCHAEOLOGY, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, WILDLIFE, DEVELOPMENT AND DAILY LIFE OF SUNBURY-ON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sunbury Embroidery Gallery
The Walled Garden
Thames Street
Sunbury-on-Thames
TW16 6AB
- Phone:
- 07753 315398
- Email:
- accounts@sunburygallery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window