Financial history SHEVES YOUTH ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1165216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.28k £17.87k £13.96k £34.22k £10.79k
Total expenditure £13.61k £17.78k £15.72k £21.95k £21.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A