JR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of JR Foundation are for the benefit of people living in Pakistan: 1) The advancement of education for the public benefit in particular by providing grants to enable children who are otherwise unable to access education due to their economic circumstances to receive an education. 2) The relief of sickness and the preservation of health for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 18 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RASHID MALIK | Chair | 18 September 2015 |
|
|||||
NARGIS MALIK | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ONESA SOHAIL | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68 | £0 | £10 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £200 | £225 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF JR FOUNDATION ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN PAKISTAN: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ENABLE CHILDREN WHO ARE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO ACCESS EDUCATION DUE TO THEIR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES TO RECEIVE AN EDUCATION AND BY PROVIDING RESOURCES AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR PRESCRIPTIONS AND MEDICATION TO INDIVIDUALS WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD MEDICATION APPROPRIATE FOR THEIR NEEDS AND PROVIDING MEDICAL FACILITIES AND HEALTH CENTRES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
298 HIGH ROAD LEYTON
LONDON
E10 5PW
- Phone:
- 02084323430
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window