THE ROYAL WESSEX YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RWxY Assn promotes the efficiency of RWxY personnel by any charitable means, including fostering esprit de corps & maintaining contact between past & present members, including antecedent regiments. It also relieves either generally or individually persons who are serving or who have served in RWxY, or the dependents of such persons, who are in conditions of suffering, need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 June 2015: CIO registration
- RWXY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Edward Sharman | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
James Richard Martin | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kennedy | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Evan Price | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £3.02k | £241 | £223 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £1.69k | £0 | £2.18k | £541 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 05 JUN 2015 AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL WESSEX YEOMANRY PERSONNEL BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS AND MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS, INCLUDING ANTECEDENT REGIMENTS. (2) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ROYAL WESSEX YEOMANRY, OR DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF SUFFERING, NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL WESSEX YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION
RAO RWXY
ALLENBY BARRACKS
BOVINGTON
WAREHAM
BH20 6JA
- Phone:
- 01929403776
- Email:
- rwxy-rhq-mainpostbox@mod.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window