Financial history Vineyard 61 Church

Charity Number: 1162655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £420.84k £504.45k £484.62k £552.55k £1.98m
Total expenditure £427.98k £466.39k £474.50k £635.90k £711.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.38k N/A £13.05k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £499.60k N/A £524.02k £1.94m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £14.14k £32.50k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £1.17m
Income - Investment N/A £742 N/A £548 £6.90k
Income - Other N/A £4.11k N/A £13.85k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £466.39k N/A £635.90k £706.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £5.78k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.48k N/A £10.28k £16.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £67.19k N/A £52.72k £47.07k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £5.78k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0