Financial history THE FRIENDS OF MOORFIELDS EYE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1161546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £573.71k £644.87k £551.11k £544.45k £528.80k
Total expenditure £1.46m £410.37k £456.51k £546.74k £617.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.22k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £309.42k £299.85k £300.41k £232.00k £239.68k
Income - Other trading activities £140.01k £35.21k £67.73k £91.65k £102.32k
Income - Charitable activities £4.08k £270.85k £71.06k £0 £111.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.07k £35.06k £44.79k £48.62k £52.34k
Income - Other £77.14k £3.90k £67.12k £172.19k £22.91k
Income - Legacies £235.04k £254.61k £154.59k £103.92k £207.54k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £383.50k £419.13k £504.98k £566.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.20k £26.87k £37.38k £41.76k £51.02k
Expenditure - Governance £20.26k £2.42k £458 £5.08k £58
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.02m £32.89k £58.45k £22.47k £51.91k
Expenditure - Investment management £11.12k £9.67k £13.65k £12.79k £12.52k
Expenditure - Other £412 £0 £0 £0 £0