Trustees SUPPORT NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Charity number: 1161753

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nitish Shah | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kendrick Jonas | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Precious Ogaji | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wankiiri | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Rashmikant Shah | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anjona Roy | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Russell Paul Adams | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WILLIAM DAVY | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.