ABSOLUTE BULL TERRIER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue & rehome Bull Terriers; supported by volunteers across the UK, we assess dogs & vet potential homes. We rehome directly from people's homes, or where necessary dogs are placed in foster homes before rehoming. We rely fully on donations & fundraising to provide the veterinary care & ongoing medical care that many of these dogs require. We promote good dog behaviour & Ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2016: Standard registration
- ABSOLUTE BULL TERRIERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison McCleave | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANNY LEAR | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAREN LANG | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.07k | £22.97k | £15.09k | £10.18k | £13.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £22.08k | £14.78k | £10.11k | £12.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/02/2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF BULL TERRIERS (SOMETIMES REFERRED TO AS ENGLISH BULL TERRIERS) IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF BULL TERRIERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 MILTON ROAD
WELLING
DA16 3NA
- Phone:
- 07527 366419
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window