Financial history HEAVEN HOMES AND CHILDREN'S CENTRES

Charity number: 1162219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £8.98k £6.50k £6.31k £7.19k £8.12k
Total expenditure £12.10k £6.03k £9.05k £8.02k £8.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A