VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a building to hold village events to inform and entertain the residents of Gussage All Saints
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 July 2015: CIO registration
- 23 June 2016: Funds received from 301134 VILLAGE HALL
- VILLAGE HALL (GUSSAGE ALL SAINTS) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Bernard Leslie Cornish | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Cornish | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ACKRILL | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANINE HOBBS | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEREK HOBBS | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ACKRILL | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ogle | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Fanner | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN RUMMERY | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PAYNE | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE CONSTANCE BUNDY | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MICHAEL MCCARTHY | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DOUGLAS HILL | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.17k | £17.71k | £6.52k | £10.67k | £8.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.96k | £12.90k | £4.53k | £7.79k | £10.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GUSSAGE ALL SAINTS IN DORSET AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR:- (1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (2) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF ITS INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Culpepper House
Gussage All Saints
Wimborne
BH21 5ET
- Phone:
- 01258840168
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window