INTERNATIONAL MISSION CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Share the Biblical values that help growth of community of Barking and Dagenham /UKto start with. Preach the Whole Goodnews to all. Engage in charitable causes that improves humanity and our environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 17 June 2015: Standard registration
- LONDON MISSION CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antony Kimani | Chair | 14 April 2001 |
|
|
||||
Lloyds Gakaka | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.40k | £24.06k | £3.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.18k | £22.50k | £3.35k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 May 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 APR 2011 as amended on 08 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED HERETO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
383 Bastable Avenue
BARKING
IG11 0QL
- Phone:
- 07930645739
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window