THE ANDERSON SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 May 1977: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CARRY ON A SCHOOL KNOWN AS THE ANDERSON SCHOOL AT BUXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY OR ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES.
Area of benefit
BUXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY OR ELSEWHERE IN THE U.K.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window