WITNEY NEW LIFE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing an environment for the Community to gather together and worship our Lord Jesus Christ. Discipleship and teaching of the Baptist Faith to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- WITNEY BAPTIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.96k | £14.28k | £17.21k | £18.12k | £15.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.39k | £13.19k | £21.36k | £26.33k | £17.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 08 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 08 August 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Jul 2015 as amended on 26 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window