Accounts and annual returns CPT.MUAZZAM ALI SHAHEED WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1163852
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 16 April 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On Time