CPT.MUAZZAM ALI SHAHEED WELFARE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We strive to create better lives Since 1998. The founder of the trust, Dr. Yousaf Akhtar, is cherished by the social welfare community in Pakistan because of his social work.The trust has created a welfare programme for the poor without any discrimination of gender, colour or religion. We strive to grow by carrying forward a greater cause; to serve the deprived and destitute people of Pakistan
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 October 2015: Standard registration
- 13 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.38k | £138.48k | £386.70k | £434.30k | £442.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.21k | £142.01k | £374.30k | £434.90k | £445.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND / OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR SICKNESS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window