PLYMOUTH & DEVON SCHOOLS SAILING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide tuition and all necessary equipment to enable members of the public to handle small boats safely under sail. To encourage participation in a healthy outdoor pursuit and foster appreciation of the local environment. These activities are open to all, including the disabled, for whom special additional help is available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 19 June 2015: CIO registration
- PDSSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD CURTIS | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rudge | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Duffield MBE | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.95k | £28.95k | £23.26k | £6.62k | £43.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.84k | £28.84k | £21.39k | £15.59k | £45.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.07k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING IN SAILING AND ASSOCIATED WATER SPORTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 HARTLEY PARK GARDENS
PLYMOUTH
PL3 5HU
- Phone:
- 01752311607
- Email:
- info.pdssa@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window