Accounts and annual returns UK FILM EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1162509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 October 2024 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 October 2024 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window