Financial history MAMUT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162740
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £282.45k £110.41k £158.75k £6.07k £0
Total expenditure £283.44k £119.73k £160.08k £6.37k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A