DASH (DISABILITIES AND SELF HELP / DELIO AG ANABLEDD A SIALENS HUNANGYMORTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission Statement: DASH: providing a range of quality leisure and supportive schemes to disabled children, young people and their families in Ceredigion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £159,705 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,249 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 21 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Davies Morgan | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Light | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellen ap Gwynn | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Moore | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Brenda McKenzie | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Eldridge | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bettina Lois Sherrington | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Lloyd James | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ERYL BRAY | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.43k | £216.81k | £195.07k | £217.89k | £162.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.96k | £176.91k | £204.71k | £211.47k | £214.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £134.77k | £145.51k | £136.59k | £159.71k | £159.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.50k | £1.25k | £1.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Sep 2015 as amended on 07 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY SUPPORTING DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF CEREDIGION (HEREIN CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OBJECT BUT FURTHER OTHERWISE: 1. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PLAY SCHEMES AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES; 2. TO PROVIDE SHORT BREAKS TO THOSE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 3. TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO VOLUNTEER AND PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTEERS TO ACTIVELY ENGAGE WITH DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. 4. TO FOSTER MUTUAL CO-OPERATION AND FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN PARENTS AND GUARDIANS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE; 5. TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE PROBLEMS FACED BY DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND TO ENCOURAGE A POSITIVE ATTITUDE TO DISABLED PEOPLE; 6. TO DO ALL OTHER THINGS LAWFUL AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DASH Ceredigion
Aberystwyth Business Hub
7A Great Darkgate Street
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 1DE
- Phone:
- 01545 570951
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window