OPERATION FISTULA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to revolutionize fistula care for women everywhere by using traceable data to drive quality improvement. Performance-based incentives provided directly to the point of care are the bridge that links resources with need. By connecting funding flows directly to patient outcomes, we create a traceable chain of accountability that gives donors confidence in the impact of their funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Cameroon
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Nepal
Governance
- 05 June 2015: Standard registration
- OPFISTULA UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akinyi Sagoe-Moses | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JERKER LILJESTRAND | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DAVID JENKINS | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £906.87k | £779.62k | £352.84k | £530.68k | £269.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £654.57k | £695.18k | £541.11k | £586.75k | £255.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £67.30k | £5.16k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £892.18k | £735.81k | N/A | £530.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.38k | £43.58k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £91 | £94 | N/A | £119 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.22k | £140 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £587.12k | £648.07k | N/A | £553.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £67.45k | £47.11k | N/A | £33.30k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.47k | £12.36k | N/A | £16.87k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £144.22k | £334.80k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 APR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF WOMEN SUFFERING FROM AN OBSTETRIC FISTULA; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR, WITHOUT LIMITATION, IN THE SUBJECT OF OBSTETRIC FISTULAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quad Workspace
311-321 Banbury Road
OXFORD
OX2 7JH
- Phone:
- 020 7801 6247
- Email:
- info@opfistula.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window