Financial history SHOTTERMILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1161679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.50k £6.67k £1.71k £11.50k £17.04k
Total expenditure £10.90k £4.21k £2.34k £10.56k £12.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £788