MAKE TIME FRIENDSHIP GROUP

Charity number: 1164228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MTFG supports people who find it hard to meet & socialise with others due to a lack of confidence that has been brought on by various life issues such as loneliness & loss of a love one. Our aim is to encourage people to join our club get involved in social activities. Day trips are low cost giving members a sense of togetherness contributing to boosting confidence, cutting out social inclusion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,035
Total expenditure: £5,074

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NONE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Manchester Chair 11 September 2015
None on record
Paul Farrington Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record
OLIVE ALLSUP Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.71k £1.56k £1.00k £2.62k £5.04k
Total expenditure £8.69k £1.22k £2.66k £3.48k £5.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Perdiswell Young
Peoples Leisure Club
Perdiswell Park
Droitwich Road
WORCESTER
WR3 7SN
Phone:
07799036926