KENT MODEL UNITED NATIONS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are committed to enhancing students understanding of the institutional and political in-working of the United Nations (UN) organisation. Through attending simulated UN conferences, students act as ambassadors, representatives, and national leaders of their assigned countries whilst debating a variety of issues in a manner consistent with the procedure of the real UN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 July 2015: CIO registration
- KENTMUN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Frank Webb | Chair | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justin Koeiman | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMEON ONAJI | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100 | £1.50k | £1.50k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £100 | £1.50k | £1.50k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 192 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 558 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 923 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
“(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE ABOUT THE WORK AND ROLE OF THE UNITED NATIONS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CONFERENCES, EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, WORKSHOPS, TALKS, SEMINARS, AND OTHER SUCH EVENTS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE LIVES OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES, AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN A CHANGING GLOBAL SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (3) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID AND GENERAL SUPPORT AS REQUIRED TO SUCH PERSONS.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
MODEL UNITED NATIONS SOCIETY
MANDELA BUILDING
CANTERBURY
CT2 7NW
- Phone:
- 07415649397
- Email:
- administrator@munkent.com
- Website:
-
munkent.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window