Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEST HISTORIC MACHINERY & VEHICLE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1163378
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 April 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 April 2023 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window