NORTH WEST HISTORIC MACHINERY & VEHICLE PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and preservation of historic commercial and non commercial vehicles. Vehicles provided to events and rallies for educational and historic purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 September 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW JOHN WHITTER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL RUDD | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MENNELL | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 440 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 440 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND REFURBISHMENT OF HISTORIC VEHICLES AND MACHINERY ("EQUIPMENT") IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES BY: (A) MAKING THE EQUIPMENT AVAILABLE TO TEACHING INSTITUTIONS; (B) PROVIDING THE EQUIPMENT AT EVENTS INCLUDING RALLIES, SHOWS AND GALAS; AND (C) PROVIDING OPEN DAYS TO THE PUBLIC TO SEE THE EQUIPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 SMALLBROOK LANE
LEIGH
WN7 5PZ
- Phone:
- 01942871900
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window