CHRISTIAN ADVENTURE HOLIDAYS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CAH provide low cost activity holidays for 12 to 17 yr olds. Each year, in school summer holidays, we hire Bassenfell Manor Christian Centre and run five consecutive weeks each attended by approx. 40 young people.Campers do a range of activities (eg:Sailing; Kayaking; Mountain Walking etc) as well as Bible studies. The cost to those able to pay is £268 per wk however weeks are free when necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- CAH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James West | Chair | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Clark | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HANDSLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
HENRY ARNETT | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID WILSON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR DAVIS BSC HONS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.44k | £50.81k | £27.61k | £71.92k | £68.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.34k | £11.60k | £23.35k | £68.56k | £80.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Aug 2015 as amended on 10 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1 OF THIS CONSTITUTION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: PROVIDING SUBSIDISED (OR, WHEN NECESSARY, FREE) ADVENTURE HOLIDAYS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT AND ETHOS. PROVIDING SUBSIDISED (OR WHEN NECESSARY, FREE) TRAINING FOR VOLUNTEERS, WHO MAY ULTIMATELY WISH TO ACT AS LEADERS OR INSTRUCTORS AT ONE OF OUR HOLIDAYS, ASSISTING OTHER LIKE MINDED ORGANISATIONS WITH FINANCE AND OTHER KINDS OF HELP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 CHECKSTONE AVENUE
DONCASTER
DN4 7JY
- Phone:
- 01302536063
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window