MAXI'S MATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rescuing stray and unwanted dogs throughout Redcar & Cleveland and Hambleton Areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 29 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Jones | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA BOYD | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane Galliford | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.10k | £130.58k | £134.05k | £183.48k | £219.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.42k | £121.34k | £126.98k | £169.13k | £197.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE A RESCUE HOME FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF STRAY DOGS IN THE TEESSIDE AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carlin Howe Farmhouse
Tocketts
GUISBOROUGH
TS14 6RG
- Phone:
- 07507104636
- Email:
- maxismates@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window