SAWA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
humanitarian aid and individual, community and social development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROUBA MHAISSEN | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Ghandour | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NIGEL OSBORNE | Trustee | 26 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 April 2025 | 772 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 April 2025 | 1137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1532 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1532 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT, NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE SUPPLY OF FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE TO SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Barn Way
Wembley
HA9 9NW
- Phone:
- 07405220057
- Email:
- sawafoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window