Financial history FRIENDS OF POULTON ST CHAD'S SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1163392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £42.60k £8.18k £7.68k £7.84k £14.61k
Total expenditure £48.52k £1.06k £1.32k £471 £312
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A