WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide activities and new experiences to people in the local community. Activities include toddler groups,women's group.craft club, carpet bowls, Monday lunch club, Mens Group, Coffee Morning, Christmas lunch and will attempt to organise anything else that people are interested in if it is within our budget. For up to date activities, please visit our website, West Moor Residents' Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,332 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 22 September 2015: CIO registration
- 22 February 2016: Funds received from 504007 WEST MOOR RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
- WMRA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET SHEILA HIND | Chair | 07 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Skelton | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Wardle | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
HAROLD HIND | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Amer | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Brownless | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Brownless | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA TATTERS | Trustee | 15 June 1990 |
|
|
||||
JOAN THOMPSON | Trustee | 07 September 1970 |
|
|
||||
MISTER GORDON HAWKINS | Trustee | 07 September 1970 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.62k | £99.00k | £99.78k | £99.78k | £107.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.60k | £76.00k | £92.68k | £92.68k | £112.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £84.35k | £24.91k | £24.91k | £2.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST MOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUTENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Moor Community Centre
Benton Lane
West Moor
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 7NP
- Phone:
- 01912161005
- Email:
- westmoorcc@Outlook.com
- Website:
-
westmoor.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window