ST. MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church did Christmas Carol services during December 2018 at all member's houses. Our parish has donated £1,400 towards Kerala flood relief fund. Plans are being made to have Holy Week services in our Church including Palm Sunday, Maundy Thursday, Good Friday and Easter services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 01 July 2015: Standard registration
- JACOBITE CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alex Paul | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anil Varghese | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libin Mathew | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anil Mathew | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bijoy Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Varkey | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saibu Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaiba Abraham | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Velson Thomas | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eldhose Varghese | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Johnson Pockayil | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.61k | £13.08k | £22.82k | £36.86k | £50.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.53k | £17.49k | £23.60k | £34.63k | £35.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN NORTHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY MAINTAINING THE FAITH, TRADITIONS AND DOCTRINES OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN CHURCH AND PERFORMING ALL THE RELIGIOUS RITES AND SACRAMENTS FOR ALL ITS MEMBERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SYRIAN ORTHODOX TRADITION AS FOLLOWED BY THE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN INDIA; CONDUCTING THE HOLY EUCHARIST, SACRAMENTS AND SERVICES ACCORDING TO THE FAITH TRADITIONS, CUSTOMS AND RITES OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH; PROVIDING HOLY SACRAMENTS TO ALL ITS MEMBERS; ESTABLISHING CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR THE WELFARE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY; ORGANISING AND CONDUCTING SUNDAY SCHOOL, PRAYER MEETINGS, RETREATS, YOUTH ASSOCIATION, VANITHA SAMAJAM (WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION), SPIRITUAL ORGANISATIONS AND ACTIVITIES; TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Battle Close
Wootton
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 6RP
- Phone:
- 07459261897
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window