Trustees ST. MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON
Charity number: 1162484

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alex Paul | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anil Varghese | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libin Mathew | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anil Mathew | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bijoy Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Varkey | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saibu Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaiba Abraham | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Velson Thomas | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eldhose Varghese | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Johnson Pockayil | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.