CARE & REPAIR CYMRU 2015

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care & Repair Cymru is a national charity who work to ensure that all older people in Wales can live independently in warm, safe and accessible homes. We lead the sector, support Care & Repair Agencies, represent older people, advocate for better policy, raise awareness about housing needs, evaluate and publicise outcomes, and make the case for more resources for front line services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,246,292
Donations and legacies | £73.74k | |
Charitable activities | £2.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £21.66k | |
Other | £70.42k |
Total expenditure:
£2,018,605
Raising funds | £3.87k | |
Charitable activities | £2.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,734,690 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.01m | |
Retained for future use | £227.69k |
People

14 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 September 2015: Standard registration
- CARE & REPAIR CYMRU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Evans | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Binding | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Athanatos | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil James Bradshaw | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BROOKS WARWICK | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fay Marie Satherley | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynne Jones | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Vye | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Davies | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE PATRICIA STROWBRIDGE | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75m | £2.31m | £2.60m | £2.24m | £2.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66m | £2.03m | £2.49m | £2.16m | £2.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.19m | £2.08m | £2.43m | £2.10m | £1.73m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.98k | £137.26k | £32.70k | £32.46k | £73.74k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.63m | £2.11m | £2.45m | £2.12m | £2.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.39k | £6.80k | £10.61k | £9.83k | £21.66k | |
|
Income - Other | £71.71k | £62.78k | £112.13k | £80.73k | £70.42k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.63m | £2.03m | £2.49m | £2.16m | £2.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £24.78k | £2.37k | £160 | £729 | £3.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.31k | £36.03k | £35.80k | £50.11k | £33.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.59k | £8.85k | £4.41k | £25.51k | £29.82k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £369.12k | £680.87k | £682.95k | £696.92k | £872.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£270.00k | -£475.00k | -£385.00k | -£368.00k | -£365.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £177.25k | £289.97k | £250.71k | £273.67k | £289.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE: (A) ALONE OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHERS (INCLUDING THE CARE & REPAIR AGENCIES REFERRED TO BELOW) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN WALES WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY (“DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE”), AND IN PARTICULAR THEIR HOUSING NEEDS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (I) CHAMPIONING THE HOUSING NEEDS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE LIVING IN OWNER OCCUPIED AND PRIVATE RENTED HOUSING THROUGH EFFECTIVE NATIONAL LOBBYING AND CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF NATIONAL PARTNERSHIPS; (II) PROMOTING THE LINKAGES BETWEEN HOUSING, HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE; (III) RESEARCHING, PUBLICISING, CAMPAIGNING AND RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS ABOUT HOUSING PROBLEMS FACED BY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE, AND SUGGESTING SUITABLE POLICY AND SERVICE SOLUTIONS TO GOVERNMENT, STATUTORY BODIES, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND THE THIRD SECTOR TO ALLEVIATE SUCH HOUSING NEED; AND (IV) PROVISION OF SERVICES THAT HELP IDENTIFY, PUBLICISE AND ALLEVIATE HOUSING NEED FACED BY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE. (B) TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) PROVIDING SERVICES AND ADVICE TO CARE & REPAIR AGENCIES IN WALES ON GRANT FUNDING APPLICATIONS, AND INFORMATION ON THE PERFORMANCE OF CARE & REPAIR AGENCIES ACROSS WALES AND OUTCOMES ACHIEVED FOR DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE; (II) PROMOTING CARE & REPAIR SERVICES THROUGH ALL MEDIA, STRATEGIC, POLITICAL AND VOLUNTARY NETWORKS; (III) INFORMING, ADVISING AND SUPPORTING CARE & REPAIR AGENCIES TO DELIVER SERVICES THAT ADDRESS INDIVIDUAL DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE’S HOUSING NEEDS; (IV) ADVISING CARE & REPAIR AGENCIES ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE CURRENT POLITICAL, ECONOMIC AND DEMOGRAPHIC CHANGES THAT HAVE AN IMPACT ON THE LIVES OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE; (V) SAFEGUARDING THE VALUES, STANDARDS, SERVICE QUALITY AND BRAND OF THE CARE & REPAIR MOVEMENT (“THE MOVEMENT”) AND DEVELOPING GOOD PRACTICE GUIDANCE AND SOUND INFORMATION; (VI) PROTECTING SUBSTANTIAL PUBLIC MONIES INVESTED IN THE MOVEMENT BY DEVELOPING ROBUST SYSTEMS THAT MONITOR AND EVALUATE THE QUALITY OF SERVICES AND OUTCOMES DELIVERED; AND (VII) PROVIDING A TRUSTED AND EXPERIENCED PLATFORM FOR DEBATE, INNOVATION AND INFORMATION ON THE HOUSING NEEDS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN WALES. IN THIS CLAUSE, “THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR” MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DEFINED AS FOLLOWS: “CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Care & Repair Cymru 2015 ltd
First Floor
Mariners House
Trident Court
East Moors Road
Cardiff
- Phone:
- 02920107580
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window