Accounts and annual returns ENFYS - THE COVENANTED CHURCHES IN WALES

Charity number: 506315
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 21 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 21 June 2005 On Time