Financial history THE INDIAN EDUCATION SOCIETY, LEICESTER

Charity number: 506316
Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £18.68k £17.48k £15.87k £16.26k £15.11k
Total expenditure £9.86k £11.45k £11.84k £10.86k £13.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A