THE H.O.B. TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects, as defined in the trust deed, are "such exclusively charitable objects and purposes as the trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Glenn Earlam | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Earlam | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £480.09k | £232.63k | £1.15k | £0 | £65.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.29k | £81.36k | £84.78k | £59.41k | £165.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/01/2016
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES (THE "OBJECTS") AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Ganghill
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 1XF
- Phone:
- 07930395661
- Email:
- thehobtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window