Financial history GUARDIAN ANGELS BIRD SANCTUARY

Charity Number: 1162553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.23k £10.68k £20.42k £10.40k £14.70k
Total expenditure £20.56k £10.46k £15.62k £17.09k £15.38k
Income from government contracts £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A