Financial history CARERS VOICE NORFOLK AND WAVENEY

Charity number: 1162438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £86.96k £181.93k £123.59k £124.65k £225.62k
Total expenditure £83.68k £100.50k £127.80k £138.14k £146.42k
Income from government contracts £86.92k N/A £59.07k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A £87.57k £154.15k