Financial history PHAB FREEWHEELERS PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED

Charity number: 506319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.55k £1.26k £2.98k £5.42k £5.56k
Total expenditure £6.10k £405 £2.68k £5.99k £6.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A