PHAB FREEWHEELERS PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Empower, Enable And Encourage People With And Without Physical Disabilities To Come Together On Equal Terms To Share Fun Activities And Friendship. We achieve this via social evenings held on alternate Wednesday evenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 18 May 1977: Standard registration
- FREEWHEELERS DISABLED (YOUTH AND ADULT) CLUB (Previous name)
- PHAB FREEWHEELERS PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED AND ABLE BODIED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL THOMAS AUSTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Olivia Davies | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Davies | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Newman Mr | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dawson | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Pass | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CERI C HULME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN LEANNE AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | £1.26k | £2.98k | £5.42k | £5.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.10k | £405 | £2.68k | £5.99k | £6.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 1976 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1977, 6 APRIL 1978, 17 APRIL 1980, 16 MAY 1985, 4 MAY 1995 AND 23 JULY 1998 as amended on 19 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE PERMANENTLY DISABLED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW VIS OR HERAFTER MAY BE DEEMED NBY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF STAFFORDSHIRE. (B) TO PROVIDE REGULAR GATHERINGS OF SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITES BETWEEN THE MEMBERS. (C) TO PROMOTE FULL PARTICIPATION, INTERGRATION, RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND FRIENDSHIPS BETWEEN THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND ABLE BODIED. (D) TO OBTAIN AN AND ACCEPT FUNDS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AD EXPENDMONIES RECEIVED FROM ANY SOURCE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE AREA OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 Mornington Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 6EL
- Phone:
- 07902776335
- Email:
- KATRINA.PAUL@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window