THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S HOOK

Charity Number: 1163071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our Charity is a parochial church council of St Paul's Church Hook. The Charity raises funds to support the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £87,126
Total expenditure: £78,188

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 2015: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PAUL'S CHURCH HOOK PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Charles Hyatt Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Alison Stevenson Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Angela Mettrick Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Simon Mettrick Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Natalie Loible Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Alison Forrester Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Laurel Devadasan Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Paula Thompson Trustee 26 April 2020
1ST HOOK SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Jane Jarman Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Graham Manton Cocks Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
DIANE PATRICIA TINK Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
MRS SUE RUSSELL Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
IAN ALEXANDER REID Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
MRS PRUE MACPHERSON Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
MADELINE CHILD Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £140.81k £85.41k £98.59k £103.85k £87.13k
Total expenditure £178.12k £95.52k £108.47k £94.44k £78.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 December 2020 35 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. PAULS CHURCH
PARISH OFFICE
280 HOOK ROAD
HOOK
CHESSINGTON
KT9 1PF
Phone:
02083912362
Email:
No information available