THE MUSE AT 269

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT FOR ARTISTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 19 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ANTHONY RAYNE | Chair | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Caplin | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damian Rayne Robert | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE RAYNE | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MCCARTHY | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.28k | £4.70k | £34.55k | £46.12k | £38.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.71k | £54.37k | £179.41k | £281.60k | £305.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 DEC 2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND RESOURCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunnyside
Green Lane
Chessington
KT9 2DT
- Phone:
- 07710294785
- Email:
- james.mccarthy@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window