DRAKE CALLEJA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust?s activities provide educational and performance opportunities to exceptional students in London. These activities are planned according to the strengths, needs and artistic aspirations of the Trust?s scholars. The Trust aims to work in genuine partnership with other organisations within music and the arts. The Trust is honoured to be associated with its Patron, Joseph Calleja.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Colin Moynihan | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Evans | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES JEAN-PIERRE DRAKE | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.63k | £112.97k | £187.98k | £119.25k | £279.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.57k | £128.37k | £223.52k | £243.56k | £178.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION), BY PROVIDING MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIPS AND/OR GRANTS FOR THOSE WITH MUSICAL TALENT OR MUSICAL INTERESTS, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Drake Calleja Trust
Sovereign House
1 Albert Place
London
N3 1QB
- Phone:
- 02084462220
- Email:
- info@drakecallejatrust.org
- Website:
-
drakecallejatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window